THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:39:21 AM
Wilson, Janet Lee
CPSO#:
55520
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Janet L. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:39 Grant Watson Dr
Tobermory, ON N0H 2R0
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |