THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:23:14 PM
Katsuno, Richard Martin
CPSO#:
55505
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
77 Front St
Sturgeon Falls ON P2B 2G9
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 21, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notification from West Nipissing General Hospital of the partial and temporary suspension of Dr. Richard Katsuno's privileges. Specifically, Dr. Katsuno's admitting privileges were temporarily suspended for the periods of January 21 -- January 24, 2013, May 8 -- May 14, 2013 and December 6 -- December 10, 2013.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD MARTIN KATSUNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSUNO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1987 |