THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:20:20 AM
Brenken, Ernst Georg
CPSO#:
55504
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6A- 170 The Donway West, Suite 910,
North York ON M3C 2E8
Phone: 416-515-7538
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERNST GEORG BRENKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENKEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1986 |