THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:59:26 AM
Bhesania, Teosar
CPSO#:
55501
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medicine Professional Corporation
Suite 104
200 Ronson Dr.
Etobicoke ON M9W 5Z9
Phone: (416) 748-9183
Fax: (416) 748-9184
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. T. Bhesania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TEOSAR BHESANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHESANIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 1989 |