THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:06:09 AM
Erlich, Christine Mary
CPSO#:
55455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Duszewski, Christine Mary (used until: 16 Dec 1985 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 109
Don Mills ON M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 445-1206
Fax: (416) 445-1235
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:14 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARY ERLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERLICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1986 |