THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:43:46 PM
Silverman, Michael Seth
CPSO#:
55442
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room B3-414
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6311
Fax: 519 646 6328
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:05 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SETH SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 1992 |