THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:04:01 PM
Lefebvre, Guylaine Gisele
CPSO#:
55434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 May 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Apt-774 Echo Dr
Ottawa ON K1S5N8
Phone: 6132406626
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Guylaine Lefebvre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GUYLAINE GISELE LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 1991 |