THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:59:01 PM
Kovesi, Thomas Andrew
CPSO#:
55431
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2868
Fax: (613) 738-4297
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:28 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:20 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS ANDREW KOVESI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVESI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1990 |