THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:35:01 AM
Garg, Avinash
CPSO#:
55425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
283 Maki Avenue
Greater Sudbury ON P3E 2P3
Phone: 705-523-4400
Fax: 705-523-4050
Electoral District: 00
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:27 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AVINASH GARG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1989 |