THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:27:49 AM
Leddy, Danielle S
CPSO#:
55416
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Leddy, Marie Theresa Danielle Suzanne (used until: 30 Apr 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1355 Bank St
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Suite 502
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 613-738-1584
Fax: 613-738-9097
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE S LEDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1987 |