THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:58:25 AM
Murphy, Patrick Gerard
CPSO#:
55413
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
270 Elgin St
Ottawa ON K2P 1M2
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
USA - Minnesota
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:07 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICK GERARD MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 1987 |