THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:12:32 AM
Weinstein, Robert Paul
CPSO#:
55410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
8th Floor, room 821
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6671
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT PAUL WEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1986 |