THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:36:16 PM
James, Debra Jean
CPSO#:
55409
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Williams, Debra Jean (used until: 06 Aug 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Oshawa Clinic
117 King St. E.
Oshawa, ON L1H 1B9
Date Received: 02 Jul 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact: Oshawa Clinic, 117 King Street East, Oshawa, ON, L1H 1B9, Tel: 905-723-8551
Date Received: 09 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2020 |