THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:29:19 PM
Rebel, Margaretha
CPSO#:
55398
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
373 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6J 1Y4
Phone: 519 685-5559
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Margaretha Rebel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARETHA REBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1990 |