THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:19:54 PM
Willoughby, Joanne Susan
CPSO#:
55395
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6103 Wellington road 7
Elora ON N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 8469964
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:14 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNE SUSAN WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1987 |