THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:16:08 PM
Downey, James Frederick
CPSO#:
55383
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 464-2891
Fax: (705) 434-2258
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Downey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 16 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:13 Sep 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES FREDERICK DOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |