THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:58:34 PM
Devlin, Mary Elizabeth
CPSO#:
55370
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 May 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-May-2012
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Elizabeth Devlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2005
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jul 2004 |