THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:30:26 AM
Puchalski, Stephen Alexander
CPSO#:
55355
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
18 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Mar 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stephen Puchalski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:514 Scenic Drive
Hamilton ON L9C 1G8
Date Received: 18 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2019 |