THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:25:52 PM
Mielke, Cornelia Ingrid
CPSO#:
55349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CORNELIA INGRID MIELKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIELKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1989 |