THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:54:50 AM
Fitzgerald, Peter Gregory
CPSO#:
55332
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4E2
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75231
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER GREGORY FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1986 |