THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:10:28 PM
Cook, Deborah Joanne
CPSO#:
55326
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33633
Fax: (905) 308-7223
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:25 May 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOANNE COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1987 |