THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:04:12 AM
Corrin, Lesley Susan
CPSO#:
55319
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304
491 Lawrence Ave west
Toronto ON M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-1775
Fax: (416) 787-3255
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLEY SUSAN CORRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2013 |