THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:05:39 PM
Vervaeke, Robert Joseph
CPSO#:
55278
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1359 Pebble Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 7R7
Phone: 6138524039
Fax: 6137072190
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH VERVAEKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERVAEKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1988 |