THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:06:56 PM
Tadross, Latif Aziz Abdel Sayed
CPSO#:
55272
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5314 Hilton Court
Mississauga ON L5M 5B5
Phone: 4374227638
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tadross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:14 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:31 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LATIF AZIZ ABDEL SAYED TADROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROSS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1990 |