THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:53:57 AM
Karambolova, Kristi Konstantinova
CPSO#:
55249
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bulgarian, English, French, Macedonian, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: K. Karambolova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:P O Box 38006, 550 Eglinton Avenue West, Castlewood, Toronto, ON, M5N 1B0
Date Received: 21 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Biochemistry |
Effective:05 Dec 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2015 |