THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:27:26 AM
Toth, Julius Lloyd Roy
CPSO#:
55244
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 May 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
56 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 853-5864
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIUS LLOYD ROY TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 May 1985 to 16 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1986 |