THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:16:04 AM
Sawka, Barry Wayne
CPSO#:
55243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Department of Laboratories
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2891
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Seaforth Community Hospital |
Seaforth |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 May 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY WAYNE SAWKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWKA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1994 |