THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:20:00 PM
Karski, Jacek Maria
CPSO#:
55230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Hospital
Hyperbaric Center
110-2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.M. Karski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACEK MARIA KARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2022 |