THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:36:32 AM
Lurie, Arnold
CPSO#:
55195
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Apr 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Arnold Lurie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 1985 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 06 Jan 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 06 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2021 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jan 2004
Summary:
On January 6, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lurie to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee ordered and directed the following:
1) that the Registrar to suspend Dr. Lurie(s certificate of registration for a period of six months, commencing January 6, 2004 at 11:59 p.m., three months of which will be suspended if Dr. Lurie provides evidence to the College of his successful completion of the College boundaries course;
2) that Dr. Lurie attend before it to be reprimanded;
3) that Dr. Lurie pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,800.00; and,
4) the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 06, 2004