THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:11:34 AM
Patel, Maltibehn Pranjeevan
CPSO#:
55190
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: University of Natal, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Malti Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street,
Hamilton. Ontario.
L8v5C2
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton, ON L8V 1C3
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:13 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 May 2022 |