THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 2:02:26 AM
Lo, Eric Lup-Sing
CPSO#:
55186
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida
USA - Illinois
USA - Kansas
USA - Kentucky
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio
USA - South Dakota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 23 Dec 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2014 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Florida Board of Medicine
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: December 18, 2019
Summary:
Effective December 18, 2019, the Florida Board of Medicine approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Eric Lup-Sing Lo and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. Dr. Lo was alleged to have violated Florida Statutes as a result of the action taken against Dr. Lo by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in October 2018 when Dr. Lo entered into an undertaking which imposed certain requirements on Dr. Lo, and (b) by not reporting the CPSO action and providing information about the CPSO action and Undertaking to the Florida Board within requisite time periods. The following penalties were imposed: a letter of concern against Dr. Lo’s medical license and a fine of $1500. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on December 24, 2019.
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: August 12, 2019
Summary:
On August 13, 2019, the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure entered into an Agreed Order with Dr. Eric Lup-Sing Lo. The Kentucky Board found that Dr. Lo had violated Kentucky law (a) as a result Dr. Lo having entered into an Undertaking with CPSO on October 1, 2018 which imposed certain requirements on Dr. Lo, and (b) by not reporting the CPSO action and providing a copy of the CPSO Undertaking to the Kentucky Board within 10 days of the date of the Undertaking. The Order of the Kentucky Board requires Dr. Lo to submit copies of summaries of CPSO policies and clinical practice guidelines that Dr. Lo was required to write pursuant to the CPSO Undertaking, copies of reassessment reports related to the CPSO Undertaking and a fine of $1.00. CPSO was notified of this action by a report received on August 19, 2019.
On May 29, 2020, the Kentucky Board terminated the 2019 Order.