THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:26:41 AM
Hakim, Ronnie
CPSO#:
55182
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
04 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Mar 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-Nov-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Management
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 15 Jan 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:05 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 04 Nov 2023 |