THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:51:30 AM
Swaminath, Sam
CPSO#:
55175
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Swaminath, Rangasamudram Subramanyam (used until: 11 Jul 1999 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Osmania University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110 Northumberland Road
London ON N6H 5H5
Phone: (519) 641-6474
Fax: (519) 641-8749
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Swaminath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
|
Active |