THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:34:42 PM
Sales, Karl Hugues
CPSO#:
55171
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Mar 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Karl Sales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may contact the hospital where they were seen by Dr. Sales.
For Kirkland and District Hospital: 145 Government Road East,
Kirkland Lake, ON, P2N 3P4, or via telephone: 705-567-5251.
For Temiskaming Hospital: 421 Shepherdson Road, New Liskeard, ON, P0J 1P0, or via telephone: 705-647-8121.
Date Received: 19 Dec 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:19 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2019 |