THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:47:52 AM
Khalaff Abourawi, Hussein Musbah
CPSO#:
55154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 230
2475 Mcdougall Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 971-0083
Fax: (519) 971-0659
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUSSEIN MUSBAH KHALAFF ABOURAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALAFF ABOURAWI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 14 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 21 Apr 1994
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2001 |