THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:18:59 AM
Abuzgaya, Fathi El Hadi
CPSO#:
55140
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Garyounis University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Level 1, Suite 100
65 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON L1S 0G2
Phone: (905) 426-2233
Fax: (905) 426-3306
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FATHI EL HADI ABUZGAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUZGAYA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1995 |