THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:26:56 PM
Gupta, Anjali
CPSO#:
55109
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sostarec, Anjali (used until: 20 Dec 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
SUDS Clinic
625 Greenhill Avenue
Hamilton ON L8K 5N8
Phone: 289-755-7837
Fax: 289-674-7837
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANJALI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 May 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1985 |