THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:27:57 AM
Benfayed, Hamdi Helal
CPSO#:
55106
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Garyounis University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
65 Bayly Street West
Suite 100, Level 1
Ajax ON L1S 7K7
Phone: (905) 426-2233
Fax: (905) 426-3306
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Hamdi Benfayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 23 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAMDI HELAL BENFAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENFAYED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1995 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 1996 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |