THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:50:31 AM
Poulopoulos, Vassilios
CPSO#:
55066
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Athens, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne St W
Soldiers Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-325-2201 Ext. 3156
Fax: 705-325-4829
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS (Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.)
111 Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 20 Apr 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:02 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VASSILIOS POULOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POULOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1992 |