THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 4:31:59 AM
Duncan, Eric George
CPSO#:
55057
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 905 848 7100
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:07 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC GEORGE DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1986 |