THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:01:03 AM
Diaz-Hermosillo, Pablo
CPSO#:
55042
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 May 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 May 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Schizophrenia Program
Fifth Floor, McCain Complex Care an
1025 Queen Street West
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32799
Fax: (416) 583-1257
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PABLO DIAZ-HERMOSILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ-HERMOSILLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 28 Feb 1986
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1999 |