THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:03:02 AM
Swamy, Guruswamy Nagasundara
CPSO#:
55038
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Kannada
Education: Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:As of December 20, 2023, patient medical records will be stored and managed at:
RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 12 Dec 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
|
Active |