THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:22:07 PM
Tanna, Nirupam Manilal
CPSO#:
54959
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Bombay, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. N. Tanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 28 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
TRILLIUM HEALTH PARTNERS
MISSISSAUGA HOSPITAL
100 QUEENSWAY WEST
ON L5B 1B8
Date Received: 27 May 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |