THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:30:07 AM
Bhattacharya, Ashok
CPSO#:
54950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
305 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON L6J 1J3
Phone: (905) 844-4825
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHOK BHATTACHARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATTACHARYA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1984 to 25 Oct 1984
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2005 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Oct 2002
Summary:
On October 17, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bhattacharya guilty of incompetence in his care and treatment of a patient.
The penalty hearing took place on December 20, 2002. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar shall impose the following terms and limitations on Dr. Bhattacharya(s certificate of registration:
a) Dr. Bhattacharya shall only practise under the supervision of a physician supervisor approved by the Registrar. The physician supervisor shall sign a written monitoring agreement acceptable to the Registrar and provide written reports to the Registrar quarterly; such reports to state whether Dr. Bhattacharya is practising at an acceptable standard of care and to comment on the adequacy of clinical records.
b) Dr. Bhattacharya shall submit a written report for every new patient on the history diagnosis and treatment plan for that patient within a reasonable time, such time to be determined by the supervisor.
c) Dr. Bhattacharya shall meet with the supervisor monthly to discuss treatment plans for new and current patients. Dr. Bhattacharya shall make his charts available to the supervisor to review for this purpose or for any other purpose considered appropriate by the supervisor in order to fulfill his/her responsibilities.
d) The supervisor shall submit quarterly reports to the Registrar on the results of the supervision.
e) Dr. Bhattacharya shall bear the costs of the supervision.
f) Dr. Bhattacharya shall successfully complete the College(s Boundaries Course within one year at his own expense.
g) After three years from the date of this Order, the Registrar may terminate the terms, conditions and limitations set out in this order if the reports received from the supervisor are satisfactory to the Registrar.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 20, 2002