THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:42:36 PM
Wong, James Ying Kin
CPSO#:
54910
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: James Ying Kin Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 25, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Wong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 25, 2022:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Wong’s knowledge, skill and judgment in his practice of anesthesia. As a result, Dr. Wong has agreed not to practice anesthesia.