THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:43:10 PM
Perkin, Thomas Reginald
CPSO#:
54856
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-4736
Fax: (519) 676-2228
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Sydenham District Hospital |
Wallaceburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS REGINALD PERKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERKIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 31 Aug 1981
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1984 |