THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:50:41 PM
Cina, Claudio
CPSO#:
54822
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 May 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Catania, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. S. Cina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 23 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2013 |