THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:26:04 AM
Rajan, Idumban Asoka
CPSO#:
54807
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
17 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: I. Asoka Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Medical Solutions
28 Eugenie St
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 18 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2019 |