THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:47:07 PM
Nazerali, Latifa Abdul
CPSO#:
54782
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 May 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Swahili
Education: National University of Ireland, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L.A. Nazerali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:01 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2017 |