THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:37:31 AM
Martin, Gregory John
CPSO#:
54767
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Manitoba, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gregory Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 1 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:61 Queen St
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B8
Date Received: 29 Jul 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2019 |